Lattice Multiplication - PowerPoint PPT Presentation

Loading...

PPT – Lattice Multiplication PowerPoint presentation | free to download - id: 5944c3-ZDI2N



Loading


The Adobe Flash plugin is needed to view this content

Get the plugin now

View by Category
About This Presentation
Title:

Lattice Multiplication

Description:

Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step 356 * 25 356 * 25 Lattice Multiplication Step-by-Step 356 * 25 356 * 25 356 * 25 = I don t remember how to multiply!!! – PowerPoint PPT presentation

Number of Views:68
Avg rating:3.0/5.0
Slides: 17
Provided by: reyno66
Learn more at: http://www.jefftwp.org
Category:

less

Write a Comment
User Comments (0)
Transcript and Presenter's Notes

Title: Lattice Multiplication


1
Lattice Multiplication
  • Step-by-Step

2
356 25
I dont remember how to multiply!!!
3
I can help!! Let me show you how to do Lattice
Multiplication.
HELP!!!
4
356 25
Make a grid the exact size of your problem. A 2
digit number times a 3 digit number gets a 2 x 3
grid. Draw a diagonal line in each box.
5
3
6
2
5
5
356 25
Multiply 6 2 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet.
5
3
6
1
2
2
5
6
356 25
Multiply 5 2 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet.
5
3
6
1
1
2
0
2
5
7
356 25
Multiply 3 2 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet. Use a zero as a place
holder.
5
3
6
1
1
0
2
0
2
6
5
8
356 25
Multiply 6 5 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet.
5
3
6
1
1
0
2
0
2
6
3
5
0
9
356 25
Multiply 5 5 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet.
5
3
6
1
1
0
2
0
2
6
3
2
5
0
5
10
356 25
Multiply 3 5 and place the answer in the grid
where the lines meet.
5
3
6
1
1
0
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
11
356 25
Now add the diagonals and place the answer below
the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal
if you have a 2 digit answer.
5
3
6
1
1
0
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
0
12
356 25
Now add the diagonals and place the answer below
the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal
if you have a 2 digit answer.
5
3
6
1
1
0
1
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
0
0
13
356 25
Now add the diagonals and place the answer below
the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal
if you have a 2 digit answer.
5
3
6
1
1
0
1
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
0
9
0
14
356 25
Now add the diagonals and place the answer below
the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal
if you have a 2 digit answer.
5
3
6
1
1
0
1
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
8
0
9
0
15
356 25
Now add the diagonals and place the answer below
the grid. Be sure to carry to the next diagonal
if you have a 2 digit answer.
5
3
6
1
1
0
1
2
0
2
6
3
2
1
5
0
5
5
8
0
9
0
16
That is Soooo Cool!!! Thanks!
356 25
8,900
About PowerShow.com